This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:14:21 (UTC).

Poole-Boykin et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Poole-Boykin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madison Poole

Colette Poole-Boykin

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy H. D'Amico

Defendant Attorney

Janice D. Lai

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

#9

#10

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021

DocketAnswer deadline updated for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to 5/7/2021. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 5/7/2021 to file an Answer or Motion Addressed to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/19/2021. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until May 7, 2021 to file an Answer or Motion Addressed to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #7 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/31/2021.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/31/2021.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2021. Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2021.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021

DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Statement of No Pending Motions (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Judicial District of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV-21-6112083-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6452381, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less