This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 08:07:20 (UTC).

Pooja Neema et al v. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Pooja Neema filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Kenneth T Cuccinelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00481

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASAVI KOTHA

SUDHA RANI CHAGALA

SANDHYA PANDEY

SARADA BONTHU

REEMA MENON

VATHSALYA KIDAMBI

Gauri Rajendra Jagtap

ANKITA KANUNGO

PRITI BINIWALE

MERLIN MATHEW

Naga Sudha Harika Taduri

SARANYA SUDANTHIRA KUMAR

VISWANATH VENKATA NARASIMHA NITTALA

MANEESHA KRISHNAN

RUPALI JAIN

SIMI TRESA ANTHONY

TRISHA KASHYAP NAGADEEPA

NAVEENAJANCY KASI BALASAMY

PRIYANKA AGARWAL

BABYNAVEENA MUDDANA

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Andrew Brown

Attorney at Reddy and Neumann PC

11000 Richmond Avenue Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Bradley B. Banias

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

38 Romney Street Suite 201

Charleston, SC 29403

Jonathan D. Wasden

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

38 Romney Street Suite 201

Charleston, SC 29403

Bernard P Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Rahula Venkat Reddy

Attorney at Reddy and Neumann PC

11000 Richmond Avenue Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Other Attorneys

Robert L. Homan

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

1620 Dodge Street Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

Lynnett M. Wagner

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

1620 Dodge Street Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#59

RESTRICTED

#58

RESTRICTED

#57

RESTRICTED

#55

RESTRICTED

#54

(#54) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #53 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D Wasden APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs DEEPIKA AHLUWALIA, GULSHAN BARAL, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, KETAKI HALDIPURKAR, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, JYOTI KANWAR, MANEESHA KRISHNAN, Anusha Naidu Kunta, SWETHA MADIREDDY, PRANTH REDDY MANDA, SIREESHA MANDURU, TANYA MATHEWS, SWAPNA MOTURU, NAREN KRISHNA NANAMADRI, SHRIVALLI AMUNJE SATHEESHA NAYAK, ARTHI PALANIAPPAN, PRIYANKA ASHIT PARIKHA, BHAVANA RAVI, VEENA SANDRA, DEBLINA SEN, VIDUSHI SHUKLA, ADITYA SUDHAKAR, RAMYA SURESH, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, PRATATHI REDDY VELIVARTHI, Usha Kamal Vedantam, designating Bernard P Wolfsdorf as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#49

(#61) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #49 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report (Dkt. #60 ) with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on March 1, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance is necessary on March 1, 2021. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #49 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report (Dkt. #60 ) with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on March 1, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance is necessary on March 1, 2021. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,,,,,,,,,,,,, #13 filed by Defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli.(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli. Robert L. Homan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli. Lynnett M. Wagner is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2/9/2021 re COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,,,,,,,,,,,,, #13 filed by defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Defendant Kenneth T Cuccinelli. Adding David Pinchas as counsel of record for Kenneth T. Cuccinelli for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Kenneth T Cuccinelli(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #53 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D Wasden APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs DEEPIKA AHLUWALIA, GULSHAN BARAL, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, KETAKI HALDIPURKAR, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, JYOTI KANWAR, MANEESHA KRISHNAN, Anusha Naidu Kunta, SWETHA MADIREDDY, PRANTH REDDY MANDA, SIREESHA MANDURU, TANYA MATHEWS, SWAPNA MOTURU, NAREN KRISHNA NANAMADRI, SHRIVALLI AMUNJE SATHEESHA NAYAK, ARTHI PALANIAPPAN, PRIYANKA ASHIT PARIKHA, BHAVANA RAVI, VEENA SANDRA, DEBLINA SEN, VIDUSHI SHUKLA, ADITYA SUDHAKAR, RAMYA SURESH, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, PRATATHI REDDY VELIVARTHI, Usha Kamal Vedantam, designating Bernard P Wolfsdorf as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs DEEPIKA AHLUWALIA, GULSHAN BARAL, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, KETAKI HALDIPURKAR, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, JYOTI KANWAR, MANEESHA KRISHNAN, Anusha Naidu Kunta, SWETHA MADIREDDY, PRANTH REDDY MANDA, SIREESHA MANDURU, TANYA MATHEWS, SWAPNA MOTURU, NAREN KRISHNA NANAMADRI, SHRIVALLI AMUNJE SATHEESHA NAYAK, ARTHI PALANIAPPAN, PRIYANKA ASHIT PARIKHA, BHAVANA RAVI, VEENA SANDRA, DEBLINA SEN, VIDUSHI SHUKLA, ADITYA SUDHAKAR, RAMYA SURESH, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, PRATATHI REDDY VELIVARTHI, Usha Kamal Vedantam (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30238731) filed by Plaintiff DEEPIKA AHLUWALIA, GULSHAN BARAL, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, KETAKI HALDIPURKAR, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, JYOTI KANWAR, MANEESHA KRISHNAN, Anusha Naidu Kunta, SWETHA MADIREDDY, PRANTH REDDY MANDA, SIREESHA MANDURU, TANYA MATHEWS, SWAPNA MOTURU, NAREN KRISHNA NANAMADRI, SHRIVALLI AMUNJE SATHEESHA NAYAK, ARTHI PALANIAPPAN, PRIYANKA ASHIT PARIKHA, BHAVANA RAVI, VEENA SANDRA, DEBLINA SEN, VIDUSHI SHUKLA, ADITYA SUDHAKAR, RAMYA SURESH, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, PRATATHI REDDY VELIVARTHI, Usha Kamal Vedantam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs Transferred from DNE, #2 Letter of Good Standing for Jonathan D. Wasden, #3 Proposed Order) (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs PRIYANKA AGARWAL, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Extend by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli.(Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli (Wagner, Lynnett) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon US Attorney defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli on 11/24/2020. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Steven A. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs Safina Ali, Srinath Ambati, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, Sarada Bonthu, Akkayya Chavala, Mahendranath Damuluri, Jugal Sudhir Daterao, Harish Digumarthi, Himabindu Dommeti, Gayathri Elavarasan, Vishali Janardhan Ennala, Chaitanya Gangineni, Reema Gupta, Ketaki Haldipurkar, Naga Sudha Harika Taduri, Desiraju Hyma, Jerline Sophia Leo Infant Raj, Gauri Rajendra Jagtap, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, Swati Bindu Kalahasthi, Sweety Radhakishan Kalani, Venkata Madhusujitha Kamisetty, Jyoti Kanwar, Lubna Khaleeli, Vijayasri Konam, Sravanthi Kothauppari, Maneesha Krishnan, Gayathri Kumaran, Anusha Naidu Kunta, Minusha Kurakula, Smitha Lnu, Shobha Rani Mallu, Merlin Mathew, Tanya Mathews, Jayakumar Sireesha Mitta, Santhosh Kumar Mugu, Shravani Nallavalli, Srilakshmi Goud Nanduti, Radhika Nathani, Pooja Neema, Divya Paravastu, Sagarika Parida, Harika Pudota, Vidya Durai Raj, Ekta Rana, Vandana Rajshekhar Rao Surapreddy, Bhavana Ravi, Samyukta Rongala, Sruthi Sagi, Tanvee Tejalbhai Shah, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Jitendra Kumar Sharma, Aditya Sudhakar, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, Usha Kamal Vedantam, Babita Verma, Divya Vidiyala, Archana Bangalore Yogendra. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Processing Times, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Gayen Roller Dec, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: USCIS Leadership, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D: FAIR Documentation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E: Teleconference Notes, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Safina Ali, Srinath Ambati, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Uma Rani Birapneni, Sarada Bonthu, Akkayya Chavala, Mahendranath Damuluri, Jugal Sudhir Daterao, Harish Digumarthi, Himabindu Dommeti, Gayathri Elavarasan, Vishali Janardhan Ennala, Chaitanya Gangineni, Reema Gupta, Ketaki Haldipurkar, Naga Sudha Harika Taduri, Desiraju Hyma, Jerline Sophia Leo Infant Raj, Gauri Rajendra Jagtap, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, Swati Bindu Kalahasthi, Sweety Radhakishan Kalani, Venkata Madhusujitha Kamisetty, Jyoti Kanwar, Lubna Khaleeli, Vijayasri Konam, Sravanthi Kothauppari, Maneesha Krishnan, Gayathri Kumaran, Anusha Naidu Kunta, Minusha Kurakula, Smitha Lnu, Shobha Rani Mallu, Merlin Mathew, Tanya Mathews, Jayakumar Sireesha Mitta, Santhosh Kumar Mugu, Shravani Nallavalli, Srilakshmi Goud Nanduti, Radhika Nathani, Pooja Neema, Divya Paravastu, Sagarika Parida, Harika Pudota, Vidya Durai Raj, Ekta Rana, Vandana Rajshekhar Rao Surapreddy, Bhavana Ravi, Samyukta Rongala, Sruthi Sagi, Tanvee Tejalbhai Shah, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Jitendra Kumar Sharma, Aditya Sudhakar, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, Usha Kamal Vedantam, Babita Verma, Divya Vidiyala, Archana Bangalore Yogendra (Banias, Bradley) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, by Attorney Steven A. Brown on behalf of Vidya Durai Raj, Srilakshmi Goud Nanduti, Akkayya Chavala, Bhavana Ravi, Sarada Bonthu, Jayakumar Sireesha Mitta, Minusha Kurakula, Pooja Neema, Srinath Ambati, Swati Bindu Kalahasthi, Merlin Mathew, Maitrai Chintankumar Joshi, Jugal Sudhir Daterao, Sagarika Parida, Desiraju Hyma, Gauri Rajendra Jagtap, Archana Bangalore Yogendra, Radhika Nathani, Jitendra Kumar Sharma, Jyoti Kanwar, Tanvee Tejalbhai Shah, Safina Ali, Chaitanya Gangineni, Ekta Rana, Usha Kamal Vedantam, Venkata Madhusujitha Kamisetty, Shobha Rani Mallu, Aditya Sudhakar, Vamsi Krishna Tekumalla, Vandana Rajshekhar Rao Surapreddy, Gayathri Kumaran, Divya Vidiyala, Harika Pudota, Babita Verma, Neeraja Ashok Bhangre, Smitha Lnu, Harish Digumarthi, Mahendranath Damuluri, Vijayasri Konam, Naga Sudha Harika Taduri, Anusha Naidu Kunta, Sruthi Sagi, Vishali Janardhan Ennala, Jerline Sophia Leo Infant Raj, Santhosh Kumar Mugu, Reema Gupta, Shravani Nallavalli, Sweety Radhakishan Kalani, Lubna Khaleeli, Divya Paravastu, Samyukta Rongala, Himabindu Dommeti, Gayathri Elavarasan, Maneesha Krishnan, Tanya Mathews, Ketaki Haldipurkar, Tanvi Rushabh Shah, Uma Rani Birapneni, Sravanthi Kothauppari (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C Historical Data, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D Kolluri Data)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to Defendant regarding Complaint,,,,, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request 2, #2 Exhibit Request 3)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4274697), by Attorney Steven A. Brown on behalf of VIDYA DURAI RAJ, SRILAKSHMI GOUD NANDUTI, BHAVANA RAVI, JAYAKUMAR SIREESHA MITTA, MINUSHA KURAKULA, POOJA NEEMA, SWATI BINDU KALAHASTHI, MERLIN MATHEW, MAITRAI CHINTANKUMAR JOSHI, JUGAL SUDHIR DATERAO, SAGARIKA PARIDA, DESIRAJU HYMA, GAURI RAJENDRA JAGTAP, ARCHANA BANGALORE YOGENDRA, RADHIKA NATHANI, JITENDRA KUMAR SHARMA, JYOTI KANWAR, TANVEE TEJALBHAI SHAH, CHAITANYA GANGINENI, EKTA RANA, USHA KAMAL VEDANTAM, VENKATA MADHUSUJITHA KAMISETTY, SHOBA RANI MALLU, ADITYA SUDHAKAR, VAMSI KRISHNA TEKUMALLA, VANDANA RAJSHEKHAR RAO SURAPREDDY, GAYATHRI KUMARAN, DIVYA VIDIYALA, HARIKA PUDOTA, BABITA VERMA, SMITHA LNU, HARISH DIGUMARTHI, MAHENDRANATH DAMULURI, VIJAYASRI KONAM, NAGA SUDHA HARIKA TADURI, ANUSHA NAIDU KUNTA, SRUTHI SAGI, JERLINE SOPHIA LEO INFANT RAJ, VISHALI JANARDHAN ENNALA, REEMA GUPTA, SANTHOSH KUMAR MUGU, SWEETY RADHAKISHAN KALANI, LUBNA KHALEENI, SHRAVANI NALLAVALLI, DIVYA PARAVASTU, SAMYUKTA RONGALA, HIMABINDU DOMMETI, GAYATHRI ELAVARASAN, MANEESHA KRISHNAN, KETAKI HALDIPURKAR, TANYA MATHEWS, TANVI RUSHABH SHAH (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Errata Exhibit D)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Nebraska on 1/19/2021.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Homan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynnett M. Wagner