This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 07:46:10

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Ponzini against Monsanto Company Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 5:19-CV-00747
  • Filing Date 05/16/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Abdul K Kallon
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Monsanto Company Corporation
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Bayer US LLC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Larry Ponzini
  • Represented By
    • Eric J Artrip

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Bayer US LL...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Monsanto Co...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Cor...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corpor...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Bayer US LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Artrip, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#4) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL No. 2741; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk mailed to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of California. (AFS) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ponzini. Monsanto Company Corporation served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Artrip, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
  • 05/22/2019
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation given back to Plaintiff for service. (AFS) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number 1126-3348983 (ALND B 4601097764). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Larry Ponzini.(KAM). (Artrip, Eric) Modified on 5/17/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer US LLC, Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Larry Ponzini.(KAM) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.