This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:08:53 (UTC).

PONUGOTI v. FARBER

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 PONUGOTI filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against FARBER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04517

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PADMA PONUGOTI

Defendant

Andrew S. Farber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J. Miroff

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Alexandria Hanauer Pittman

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Defendant Attorneys

Emily A. Kile-Maxwell

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Philip John Gutwein, II

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Matthew Thomas Albaugh

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B: VSP

1 #1

Exhibit A: Adoption Agreement

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/5/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 1/10/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/27/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 1-10-2020 in which to File and Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant ANDREW S. FARBER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutwein, Philip) Modified on 11/27/2019 (CKM). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Kile-Maxwell on behalf of Defendant ANDREW S. FARBER. (Kile-Maxwell, Emily) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Albaugh on behalf of Defendant ANDREW S. FARBER. (Albaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip John Gutwein, II on behalf of Defendant ANDREW S. FARBER. (Gutwein, Philip) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by PADMA PONUGOTI. ANDREW S. FARBER served on 11/13/2019. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to ANDREW S. FARBER. (DJH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Plaintiff PADMA PONUGOTI. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Miroff on behalf of Plaintiff PADMA PONUGOTI. (Miroff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew S. Farber, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5716800) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Adoption Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: VSP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Miroff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandria Hanauer Pittman