Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 07:26:30 (UTC).

Nimfa Pontillas v. Fidelity Life Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Nimfa Pontillas filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fidelity Life Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02211

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nimfa Pontillas

Defendants

DOES 1 through 50

Fidelity Life Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Lawrence Bruchey

Attorney at Shernoff Bidart Echeverria LLP

301 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Howard S Shernoff

Attorney at Shernoff Bidart Echeverria Bentley LLP

301 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

William M Shernoff

Attorney at Shernoff Bidart Echeverria LLP

301 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa M Cowan

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proof of Service

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-7 days, filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

11 #4

Proof of Service

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Declaration of Samuel L. Bruchey

11 #1

Declaration of Melissa M. Cowan

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from January 24, 2020 to February 28, 2020 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa M. Cowan, #2 Declaration of Samuel L. Bruchey, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. See document for details. (tg) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 11/19/2019. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association, identifying (1) Plaintiff Nimfa Pontillas; and (2) Defendant Fidelity Life Association, A Legal Reserve Life Insurance Company (erroneously sued as Fidelity Life Association, A Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101262-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24786130 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Melissa M Cowan added to party Fidelity Life Association(pty:dft))(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-7 days, filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from January 24, 2020 to February 28, 2020 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa M. Cowan, #2 Declaration of Samuel L. Bruchey, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. See document for details. (tg) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 11/19/2019. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nimfa Pontillas in Orange County Superior Court on 9/30/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association, identifying (1) Plaintiff Nimfa Pontillas; and (2) Defendant Fidelity Life Association, A Legal Reserve Life Insurance Company (erroneously sued as Fidelity Life Association, A Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101262-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24786130 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Melissa M Cowan added to party Fidelity Life Association(pty:dft))(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fidelity Life Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa M Cowan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima