This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:14 (UTC).

Ponder v. Togut

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Ponder filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Togut. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05493

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Lamar Ponder

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant

Torin D. Togut

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

George Brian Spears

Attorney at Law Office of Brian Spears

1126 Ponce De Leon Avenue

Atlanta, GA 30306

David Sean Cason

Attorney at Law Office of David S. Cason

Suite 400-163, 306 Exchange Blvd.

Bethlehem, GA 30620

 

Court Documents

8 #4

Exhibit C

#8

(#8) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) Withdrawal of Motion #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery , #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Torin D. Togut. (Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

8 #3

Exhibit B

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Brief

5 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Brief

8 #2

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Torin D. Togut by Torin D. Togut.(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Non-Service of Defendant's Motions by Brian Lamar Ponder. (tcc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#13

RESTRICTED

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification of Docket Correction re #13 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE--- Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/30/20.(ah) Modified to edit text on 1/30/2020 (ah) (ah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE--- Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/30/20.(ah) Modified to edit text on 1/30/2020 (ah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Torin D. Togut by Torin D. Togut.(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Withdrawal of Motion #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery , #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Torin D. Togut. (Spears, George) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Non-Service of Defendant's Motions by Brian Lamar Ponder. (tcc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Torin D. Togutwith Jury Demand filed by Brian Lamar Ponder.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #6 MOTION to Stay Discovery, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Torin D. Togut. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Spears, George) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by George Brian Spears on behalf of Torin D. Togut (Spears, George) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Torin D. Togut (Spears, George) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Torin D. Togut. Discovery ends on 5/4/2020. (Originally filed in State Court on 12/3/2019) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Torin D. Togut (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9153740). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Defenses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.