This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:18 (UTC).

Ponder v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Ponder filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05494

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Lamar Ponder

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Crawford Reynolds

Attorney at Jones Day-Atlanta

Suite 800, 1420 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3053

Michael I. Krause

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Krause, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Brian Lamar Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9153760). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/19/2020.(Krause, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Krause on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 #1

Letter

3 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#5

(#5) NOTICE and RESPONSE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Brian Lamar Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(tcc) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

5 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/19/2020.(Krause, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE and RESPONSE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Brian Lamar Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(tcc) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Brian Lamar Ponder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Krause, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Krause on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Krause, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9153760). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.