This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 09:26:52 (UTC).

Ponce-Gonzalez v. Greenwalt

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Ponce-Gonzalez filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Greenwalt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miguel Ponce-Gonzalez

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondent

Warden D. Greenwalt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Bradford Collins Patrick

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970

Savannah, GA 31412

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by D. Greenwalt. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to file a response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/1/2020. (ca) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miguel Ponce-Gonzalez. $5.00 Filing fee paid - Receipt Number: BWK010159. (csr) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Miguel Ponce-Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(MG) Modified on 12/15/2020 (ca). Modified on 12/15/2020 linkage added (cmr). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/15/2020. (ca) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by D. Greenwalt. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to file a response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/1/2020. (ca) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (MG) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by D. Greenwalt. Responses due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sonya Lewis w/attachs)(Patrick, Bradford) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miguel Ponce-Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/29/20. (slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2020: #1 USM 285 forms) (slt). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miguel Ponce-Gonzalez. $5.00 Filing fee paid - Receipt Number: BWK010159. (csr) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less