This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:19:47 (UTC).

POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP. v. 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05943

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP.

Defendant

'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENNIFER R. HOOVER

Attorney at BENESCH, FRIEDLANDER, COPLAN & ARONOFF, L.L.P.

1650 Market Sreet, 36Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOHN C. GENTILE

Attorney at BENESCH FRIEDLANDER COPLAN & ARONOFF, LLP

1650 Market Street, Suite 3652

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JENNIFER M. TURK

Attorney at BENESCH FRIEDLANDER COPLAN & ARONOFF LLP

41 South High St Suite 2600

Columbus, OH 43016

Defendant Attorney

BONNIE M. HOFFMAN

Attorney at HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL & PUDLIN

One Logan Square, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES with Certificate of Service(HOFFMAN, BONNIE) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/12/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/22/20. 1/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER M. TURK, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/22/20.1/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP; MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14056659.) filed by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer M. Turk.(HOOVER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE A TWENTY-ONE DAY EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL FEBRUARY 24, 2020, TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/6/20. 2/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 2/7/2020 (jaa, ). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER THAT THE FED R. CIV. P 16 CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/18/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/11/20. 2/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lisad, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION/PETITION Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5.2(b) for Jennifer M. Turk Admission by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (HOOVER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208451.), filed by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#11

(#11) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING; RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE FOR ITS RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS NOT DUE UNTIL FEBRUARY 24, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/10/20. 2/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/11/2020) (jaa, ). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. GENTILE on behalf of POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP. (GENTILE, JOHN) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon 'Doc' Johnson Enterprises c/o Ronald A. Braverman by FedEx Priority Overnight on January 13, 2020, answer due February 3, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HOOVER, JENNIFER) Modified on 1/16/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER THAT THE FED R. CIV. P 16 CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/18/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/11/20. 2/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lisad, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING; RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE FOR ITS RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS NOT DUE UNTIL FEBRUARY 24, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/10/20. 2/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/11/2020) (jaa, ). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE A TWENTY-ONE DAY EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL FEBRUARY 24, 2020, TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/6/20. 2/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 2/7/2020 (jaa, ). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by BONNIE M. HOFFMAN on behalf of 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES with Certificate of Service(HOFFMAN, BONNIE) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/12/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/22/20. 1/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER M. TURK, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/22/20.1/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP; MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION/PETITION Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5.2(b) for Jennifer M. Turk Admission by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (HOOVER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14056659.) filed by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer M. Turk.(HOOVER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. GENTILE on behalf of POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP. (GENTILE, JOHN) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon 'Doc' Johnson Enterprises c/o Ronald A. Braverman by FedEx Priority Overnight on January 13, 2020, answer due February 3, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HOOVER, JENNIFER) Modified on 1/16/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket1 Summons Issued as to 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/18/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 'DOC' JOHNSON ENTERPRISES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208451.), filed by POLYTEK DEVELOPMENT CORP..(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.