This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

Pollock v. Federal National Mortgage Association

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Pollock filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Federal National Mortgage Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven J. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01260

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven J. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robyn J.B. Pollock

Defendant

Federal National Mortgage Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randall Baldwin Clark

Attorney at Clark Law Offices

80A W. Hollis Rd

Hollis, NH 03049

Defendant Attorney

Daniel P. Murphy

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh PC

60 Man-Mar Dr, Ste 7

Plainville, MA 02762

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Original Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Notice to Counsel of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk of Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Enjoin Foreclosure

3 #2

Exhibit Summons

3 #3

Exhibit Appearance of Daniel P. Murphy, Esq. In the State Court

3 #4

Exhibit Appearance of Sarah A. Billeri, Esq. in the State Court

3 #5

Notice ECF Notice of Removal from State Court

3 #6

Exhibit Certificate and Return of Service

#4

#5

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketTRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 2/12/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/16/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 3/16/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/1/2020. Joint Statement re: Mediation Follow Up on 5/18/2020. Discovery deadline 10/17/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/17/2020. (lw) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELATION - Pretrial Conference scheduled for 2/12/2020 @ 10:30 a.m. has been canceled. (lw) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Murphy, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/6/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Federal National Mortgage Association's ANSWER to Complaint filed by the Plaintiff in Hillsborough Superior Court, NH filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Murphy, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-01072, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Enjoin Foreclosure, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Appearance of Daniel P. Murphy, Esq. In the State Court, #4 Exhibit Appearance of Sarah A. Billeri, Esq. in the State Court, #5 Notice ECF Notice of Removal from State Court, #6 Exhibit Certificate and Return of Service)(Murphy, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 19-cv-1260-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Murphy, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court, ND, case number 216-2019-CV-01072 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1911042) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Answer Follow Up on 1/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to Counsel of Removal, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Baldwin Clark