This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:39:44 (UTC).

Pollard v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Pollard filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01209

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elmer Pollard

Defendants

Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.

One World Technologies, Inc.

Ryobi Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dylan J. Hooper

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole D. Walsh

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd - Ste 3700, Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Christopher Shawn Branton

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd - Ste 3700, Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Robert M. Fulton

Attorney at Hill Ward & Henderson, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#18) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2021 Discovery due by 8/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2022 Pretrial statement due by 1/12/2023 All other motions due by 12/29/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/25/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/25/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/25/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/17/2021. (BIA) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Branton, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. The Court notes that the filing does not appear to comply with the typography requirements of Local Rule 1.08; further noncompliant filings will be stricken. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/25/2021. (LLM) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elmer Pollard. Related case(s): No (Hooper, Dylan) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Order directing compliance, #5 Order pdf by Elmer Pollard. (Hooper, Dylan) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER directing compliance to #5 Initial Order. On or before September 3, 2021, the Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/23/2021. (BIA) (ctp) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #9 Amended Complaint by One World Technologies, Inc..(Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (LLM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against One World Technologies, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Elmer Pollard.(Hooper, Dylan) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend. By Wednesday, August 11, 2021, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file the amended complaint (Doc. 4-1) as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (BIA) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by One World Technologies, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by One World Technologies, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/2/2021. (BIA) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Elmer Pollard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Hooper, Dylan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1209-RBD-DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-033522 (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18521144) filed by One World Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Composite Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Nicole) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYOBI TECHNOLOGIES, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Shawn Branton(Designation Retained)