This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 09:50:54 (UTC).

POLLARD v. SALUS UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 POLLARD filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SALUS UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01806

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES POLLARD

Defendant

SALUS UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Rd, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of JAMES POLLARD (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of JAMES POLLARD (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/30/21. 4/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES POLLARD. SALUS UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SALUS UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15063201.), filed by JAMES POLLARD.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of JAMES POLLARD (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of JAMES POLLARD (CERUTTI, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/30/21. 4/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES POLLARD. SALUS UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to SALUS UNIVERSITY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/19/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES POLLARD. (fb) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SALUS UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15063201.), filed by JAMES POLLARD.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI R. KARPF