This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2021 at 07:08:03 (UTC).

Pollard v. Accellion, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Pollard filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Accellion, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward J. Davila and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02572

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janet Pollard

Defendants

Accellion, Inc.

Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.

Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. doing business as Flagstar Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Moshe Rotter

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kara M Wolke

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Pavithra Rajesh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marc Lawrence Godino

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie Marilyn Blunschi

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael H. Rubin

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

William Elliott Ridgway

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606-1720

Lance Allan Etcheverry

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue, Suite 1400

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Lindsey J Sieling

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher and Flom LLP

155 N. Wacker Drive, Ste 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Niels Jon Melius

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Ave.

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#22

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Granting #23 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey Sieling, Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/21/2021. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15993730.) filed by Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.. (Sieling, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/20/2021) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.. (Ridgway, William) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Niels Jon Melius on behalf of Defendant Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. (Melius, Niels) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Allan Etcheverry on behalf of Defendant Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by William Elliott Ridgway on behalf of Defendant Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. (Ridgway, William) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by Janet Pollard of Withdrawal of Attorney Mary Jane Fait (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order in case 5:21-cv-01155-EJD Granting (32) Stipulation in case 5:21-cv-02239-EJD and Related Cases To Toll Deadlines To Respond To Class Plaintiffs' Complaints And To Extend The Time To Answer Or Respond To Class Plaintiffs' Complaints Or A Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2021. Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-02239-EJD, 5:21-cv-01155-EJD, 5:21-cv-01203-EJD, 5:21-cv-01272-EJD, 5:21-cv-01353-EJD, 5:21-cv-01430-EJD, 5:21-cv-01645-EJD, 5:21-cv-01708-EJD, 5:21-cv-01887-EJD, 5:21-cv-02525-EJD, 5:21-cv-02572-EJD, 5:21-cv-02975-EJD. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Toll Deadlines to Respond to Class Plaintiffs' Complaints and to Extend the Time to Answer or Respond to Class Plaintiffs' Complaints or a Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Accellion, Inc.. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#15) (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re Related Case Order. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 04/21/2021. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Janet Pollard. Service waived by Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Janet Pollard. Service waived by Accellion, Inc. waiver sent on 4/13/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Accellion, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Accellion, Inc., Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15815633.). Filed byJanet Pollard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melanie Marilyn Blunschi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Elliott Ridgway