This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 07:23:33 (UTC).

Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC v. AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AmTRAN Technology Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01630

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC

Defendants

AmTRAN Logistics, Inc.

AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Francois Kramer

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

M Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Nicholas V Martini

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Kate E Hart

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Marc C Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Aidan McKenzie Brewster

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real, Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

David L Alberti

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Russell S Tonkovich

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich and Belloli LLP

1600 El Camino Real Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant Attorneys

Russell T Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Cheryl S Chang

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Dipu A Doshi

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Megan R Wood

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #25 Non-Resident Attorney Dipu A. Doshi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dipu A. Doshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24598389) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #22 Non-Resident Attorney Russell T. Wong APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Wood APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell T. Wong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24550972) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24550905) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC, (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 1, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Cheryl S Chang added to party AmTRAN Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cheryl S Chang added to party AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #25 Non-Resident Attorney Dipu A. Doshi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dipu A. Doshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24598389) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #22 Non-Resident Attorney Russell T. Wong APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Wood APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amtran Technology Co., LTD, and Amtran Logistics, Inc, designating Cheryl S. Chang as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell T. Wong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24550972) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24550905) filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 45 DAYS, #18 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Amtran Logistics, Inc. and AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. shall have an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff Polaris Powerled Technologies, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement up and through November 1, 2019. (es) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. upon AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. Waiver of Service signed by AMTRAN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.. (Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 1, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Cheryl S Chang added to party AmTRAN Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cheryl S Chang added to party AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chang, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/28/2019. (lb) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-01571- JVS-DFM (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants AmTRAN Logistics, Inc., AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. (lh) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC, (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24317071 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Robert Francois Kramer added to party Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Kramer, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amtran Technology Co Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Polaris PowerLED Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas V Martini

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Steven Tonkovich