This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:09:25 (UTC).

POLANSKY v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 POLANSKY filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01628

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSE POLANSKY

Baltimore, MD 21210

Defendant

CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JESSE POLANSKY. (zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/7/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JESSE POLANSKY. (zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 202327) filed by JESSE POLANSKY. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant