This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 11:08:22 (UTC).

Poland v. Springs Window Fashions, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Poland filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Springs Window Fashions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Poland

Defendant

Springs Window Fashions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Eugene Morelli, III

Attorney at Jackson, Shields, Yesier, Holt, Owen & Bryant

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Leyes

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP - Memphis

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 312

Memphis, TN 38120

Christina Jaremus

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Ste 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Noah Finkel

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Ste 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#57

#56

#55

54 #3

Text of Proposed Order

54 #2

Exhibit B - Joint Proposed Notice & Consent

54 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification

#54

#52

#51

50 #1

*Restricted*

#50

#49

45 #7

Attachment 7

45 #6

Attachment 6

45 #5

Attachment 5

45 #4

Attachment 4

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Michele Poland. (Consent to Join Diane Uberta.) (Morelli, Robert) Modified on 5/5/2021. (lak) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER accepting #54 Stipulation on Plaintiff's Motion for Fair Labor Standards Act Conditional Certification. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/16/2021. (rks) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Joint Discovery Plan (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Stipulation on Plaintiff's Motion for Fair Labor Standards Act Conditional Certification, by Plaintiff Michele Poland, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Proposed Notice & Consent, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Morelli, Robert) Modified on 4/15/2021. (lak) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#53) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At an April 2, 2021 unrecorded telephonic status conference with counsel for both sides, the court offered the parties two firm trial dates: September 19, 2022 or October 31, 2022, with the Rule 56 motion filing deadline six months before the trial date chosen. Not later than April 16, 2021, the parties are to report jointly which trial date they have chosen and to suggest hard dates for discovery deadlines and the anticipated motion to decertify the conditionally certified class. (The parties are stipulating to conditional certification). The court then will issue the preliminary pretrial conference order that sets the entire schedule in this case. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/2/2021. (rks) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2021 [:15] (skv) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Jaremus, Christina) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consents to Join Edward Fulop and Sonya Alzayaady (Morelli, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of Michele Poland (Matthews, Benjamin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Springs Window Fashions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3383745), filed by Michele Poland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Michele Poland Consent to Join, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to be Issued)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 3/12/2021.] (lak). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRINGS WINDOW FASHIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney L. Leyes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Jaremus