This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:22:53 (UTC).

Poland v. Springs Window Fashions, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Poland filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Springs Window Fashions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02489

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Poland

Defendant

Springs Window Fashions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#10

#9

#8

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons to be Issued

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A- Michele Poland Consent to Join

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consent to Join Leonard Stovall (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consent to Join Janice Killian (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consents to Join Janel Grant and Kristy Mitchell (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Poland as to Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consent to Join Susan Miller (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to Springs Window Fashions, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consent to Join Valerie Askew (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consents to Join Jean Reckert, Anthony Dworak and Jim Nader (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consent to Join Jacuelyn Butler (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consents to Join Kevin Delsandro and Kristen Gettel-Barrett (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Michele Poland Consents to Join Edward Fulop and Sonya Alzayaady (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of Michele Poland (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Springs Window Fashions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3383745), filed by Michele Poland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Michele Poland Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to be Issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRINGS WINDOW FASHIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Alan Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant