Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:51:19 (UTC).

Poindexter v. Kauffman et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Poindexter filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kauffman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Malachy E Mannion and DB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00770

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

Referral Judge

DB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dewell Poindexter

Huntingdon, PA 16654-1112

Defendants

Supt. Kevin Kauffman

Hearing Examiner CJ McKeown

Officer R. Stiger

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Request/ MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(cl) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/18/19 (bs) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(ga) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#18

(#18) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Kevin Kauffman, R. Stiger with copy of Waiver Order and Complaint; copy of Waiver Order and Complaint also mailed to PA State Atty General; Waiver of Service due by 7/8/2019.(ep) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants, send copy order to warden/superintendent to arrange PLRA filing fee payments and to terminate C.J.McKeown on docket ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #15 to remove Deft. C.J.McKeown; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 06/07/19. (ep) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER denying #5 #9 Motions to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/7/19 (bs) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) Letter/Request to terminate a party and add a new party from Dewell Poindexter (ga) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#13

(#13) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 05/15/2019. (lp) Modified on 5/15/2019 (lp). Order sent to plaintiff and Superintendent. (Entered: 05/15/2019)

7 #1

285 Service Packet with IFP Notice

#7

(#7) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#5

(#16) ORDER denying #5 #9 Motions to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/7/19 (bs) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Dewell Poindexter allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#3

(#17) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants, send copy order to warden/superintendent to arrange PLRA filing fee payments and to terminate C.J.McKeown on docket ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #15 to remove Deft. C.J.McKeown; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 06/07/19. (ep) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) EXHIBITS by Dewell Poindexter re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#1

(#2) EXHIBITS by Dewell Poindexter re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Request/ MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(cl) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/18/19 (bs) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(ga) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Kevin Kauffman, R. Stiger with copy of Waiver Order and Complaint; copy of Waiver Order and Complaint also mailed to PA State Atty General; Waiver of Service due by 7/8/2019.(ep) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants, send copy order to warden/superintendent to arrange PLRA filing fee payments and to terminate C.J.McKeown on docket ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #15 to remove Deft. C.J.McKeown; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 06/07/19. (ep) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #5 #9 Motions to Appoint Counsel.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/7/19 (bs) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dewell Poindexter. (ep) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Letter/Request to terminate a party and add a new party from Dewell Poindexter (ga) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 05/15/2019. (lp) Modified on 5/15/2019 (lp). Order sent to plaintiff and Superintendent. (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dewell Poindexter.(ep) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(cl) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dewell Poindexter.(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Dewell Poindexter allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dewell Poindexter.(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBITS by Dewell Poindexter re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kevin Kauffman, CJ McKeown, R. Stiger lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Dewell Poindexter.(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less