This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:59:59 (UTC).

Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. et al v. Siemens Industry, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Siemens Industry, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson, Carlton W. Reeves and Tom S. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00474

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judges

Carlton W. Reeves

Tom S. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc.

William S. Kellum

Charles Jordan

Belinda Chase

Defendant

Siemens Industry, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip C. Hearn

Attorney at HEARN LAW FIRM

1510 North State Street, P. O. Drawer 5009 (39202)

Jackson, MS 39296-5009

Joel R. Rhine - PHV

Attorney at RHINE LAW FIRM, PC

1612 Military Cutoff Rd., Suite 300

Wilmington, NC 28403

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew H. Lembke - PHV

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Birmingham

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

Stanley Blackmon - PHV

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Birmingham

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

Roy D. Campbell, III

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 1789, 188 E. Capitol Street, Suite 400 (39201)

Jackson, MS 39215-1789

Tiffany J. deGruy - PHV

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Birmingham

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

Kenneth Perry - PHV

Attorney at KEN PERRY LAW FIRM, LLC

1615 Financial Center, 404 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit North Carolina good standing certificate

#13

(#13) MOTION for Joel R. Rhine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4068279) by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Carolina good standing certificate)(Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Tiffany J. deGruy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063856) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Stanley Blackmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063848) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Matthew H. Lembke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063840) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Kenneth Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063829) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy D. Campbell, III on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER granting Defendant until 9/9/2019 to file response/answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/8/2019. (ACF) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum. Siemens Industry, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (ND) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Siemens Industry, Inc. (KNS) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/08/19 (KNS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Siemens Industry, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4029648) filed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase and William S. Kellum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joel R. Rhine is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/22/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Joel R. Rhine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4068279) by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Carolina good standing certificate)(Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kenneth Perry, Matthew H. Lembke, Stanley Blackmon and Tiffany J. deGruy are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Siemens Industry, Inc., in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/20/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 : Motions and exhibits are filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (KNS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Tiffany J. deGruy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063856) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Stanley Blackmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063848) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Matthew H. Lembke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063840) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Kenneth Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063829) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy D. Campbell, III on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AGREED ORDER granting Defendant until 9/9/2019 to file response/answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/8/2019. (ACF) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum. Siemens Industry, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Reissued as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (ND) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Hearn, Philip) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Siemens Industry, Inc. (KNS) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/08/19 (KNS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Siemens Industry, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4029648) filed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase and William S. Kellum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.