This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 07:18:33 (UTC).

POGUE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 POGUE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Richard L. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01846

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEAN POGUE

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John T. Kirtley, III

Attorney at Ferrer Poirot Wansbrough

2603 Oak Lawn Ave., Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75219

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Kirtley, III on behalf of Plaintiff JEAN POGUE. (Kirtley, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#13

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB et al. (Pierson, Andrea) Modified on 10/17/2022 (LBT). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#14

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB et al. (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#6

(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/28/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Richard L. Young, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-1846 RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (LF) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB et al. (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB et al. (Pierson, Andrea) Modified on 10/17/2022 (LBT). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docket(#5) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:22-cv-01799-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01814-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01846-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 9/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01799-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01814-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01846-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/28/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Richard L. Young, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-1846 RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (LF) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Kirtley, III on behalf of Plaintiff JEAN POGUE. (Kirtley, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JEAN POGUE. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7284725) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirtley, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald