This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:07:52 (UTC).

Pofahl et al v. Axos Bank

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Pofahl filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Axos Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles Frederick Pofahl

Big Country Hauling LLC d/b/a Big Country Hauling

Defendant

Axos Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua David Gordon

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm PLLC

6200 Savoy Drive, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Robert Chamless Lane

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm PLLC

6200 Savoy Drive, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorneys

C Jeffrey Novel

Attorney at Kane Russell Coleman & Logan PC

901 Main Street, Suite 5200

Dallas, TX 75202

Andrew D Robertson

Attorney at Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC

1601 Elm Street, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: The Court has reviewed the plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), Dkt. No. #7 , and finds that dismissal should begranted. It is therefore ordered that ail claims brought by Pofahl and Big Country Hauling in this matter are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 1/8/2020) (krr) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Big Country Hauling LLC d/b/a Big Country Hauling, Charles Frederick Pofahl (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL) (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than January 10, 2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 24, 2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 12/23/2019) (zzm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Axos Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1) (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Axos Bank. (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Axos Bank identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Axos Financial, Inc. for Axos Bank. (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet Supplement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 268th District Court, Hockley County, Texas, case number 191126057 filed by Axos Bank. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460591) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s)) (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: The Court has reviewed the plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), Dkt. No. #7 , and finds that dismissal should begranted. It is therefore ordered that ail claims brought by Pofahl and Big Country Hauling in this matter are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 1/8/2020) (krr) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Big Country Hauling LLC d/b/a Big Country Hauling, Charles Frederick Pofahl (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL) (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Dec 23 16:58:55 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than January 10, 2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 24, 2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 12/23/2019) (zzm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Axos Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1) (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Axos Bank. (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Axos Bank identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Axos Financial, Inc. for Axos Bank. (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 268th District Court, Hockley County, Texas, case number 191126057 filed by Axos Bank. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460591) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s)) (Novel, C) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less