This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:25 (UTC).

Poborsky v. McCarthy Burgess & Wolff Inc

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Poborsky filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against McCarthy Burgess Wolff Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01996

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Poborsky

Defendants

McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.

McCarthy Burgess & Wolff Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason D Anderson

Attorney at ANDERSON SANTIAGO PLLC

787 Maynard Ave S., Ste 201

Seattle, WA 98104

Thomas Tyler Santiago

Attorney at ANDERSON SANTIAGO PLLC

787 Maynard Ave S., Ste 201

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorney

Amy P Taylor

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP (WA)

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McCarthy Burgess & Wolff Inc (Taylor, Amy) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Complaint Summons and Complaint

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Receipt # 0981-6040788), filed by McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #3 Complaint) (SNP). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McCarthy Burgess & Wolff Inc (Taylor, Amy) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/16/2019. (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Receipt # 0981-6040788), filed by McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #3 Complaint) (SNP). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.