This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 08:21:09 (UTC).

Pneu-Dart, Inc. v. General Star Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Pneu-Dart, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against General Star Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Pneu-Dart, Inc.

Defendants

General Star Management Company

General Star Indemnity Company

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

General Star Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brandon R Griest

Attorney at McNerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall

433 Market St

Williamsport, PA 17701

Thomas C. Marshall

Attorney at McNerney, Page, Vanderlin & Hall

433 Market Street, P.O. Box 7

Williamsport, PA 17703

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan S. Miller

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh, P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 401 Liberty Ave, 22Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Emily S Hart

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Cara Tseng Duffield

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Emily S. Hart. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/19/2020. (lg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 6/1/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 7/1/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 7/29/2021. Pretrial Memos due by 8/12/2021. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/31/2021 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on October 2021 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/18/2020. (jr) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

20 #3

Supplement No. 3

20 #2

Supplement No. 2

20 #1

Supplement No. 1

#20

(#20) Supplement by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. to #17 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Supplement No. 1, #2 Supplement No. 2, #3 Supplement No. 3)(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#19

(#19) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Emily S Hart on behalf of General Star Indemnity Company Attorney Emily Hart is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5095870.. (Hart, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#17

(#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pneu-Dart, Inc..(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#15

(#15) Amended ANSWER to Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Pneu-Dart, Inc. by General Star Indemnity Company.(Duffield, Cara) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 4/17/2020.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/2020. (caw) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 4/17/2020.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/2020. (caw) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/30/2020. (jr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Star Management Company identifying Corporate Parent General Star Management Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of General Reinsurance Corporation. General Re Corporation is the parent corporation of General Reinsurance Corporation. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. is the parent corporation of General Re Corporation and owns more than 10% of General Star Management Company. for General Star Management Company. (Miller, Alan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit "Complaint"

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Star Management Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-0440. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5047317), filed by General Star Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "Complaint", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Emily S. Hart. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/19/2020. (lg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 6/1/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 7/1/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 7/29/2021. Pretrial Memos due by 8/12/2021. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/31/2021 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on October 2021 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/18/2020. (jr) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Supplement by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. to #17 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Supplement No. 1, #2 Supplement No. 2, #3 Supplement No. 3)(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified D.C. bar record of Attorney Emily S. Hart. (lg) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Emily S Hart on behalf of General Star Indemnity Company Attorney Emily Hart is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5095870.. (Hart, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) EXHIBIT Exhibits to Amended Answer and Counterclaim by General Star Indemnity Company re #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8)(Duffield, Cara) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pneu-Dart, Inc..(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended ANSWER to Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Pneu-Dart, Inc. by General Star Indemnity Company.(Duffield, Cara) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/18/2020 at 4:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/20/2020. (jr) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Pneu-Dart, Inc. by General Star Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8)(Miller, Alan) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Caption is granted. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/3/2020 (lg) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Substitute Correct Name of Defendant by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griest, Brandon) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 4/17/2020.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/2020. (caw) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by General Star Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/30/2020. (jr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Star Management Company identifying Corporate Parent General Star Management Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of General Reinsurance Corporation. General Re Corporation is the parent corporation of General Reinsurance Corporation. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. is the parent corporation of General Re Corporation and owns more than 10% of General Star Management Company. for General Star Management Company. (Miller, Alan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Star Management Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-0440. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5047317), filed by General Star Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "Complaint", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less