This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2020 at 11:36:42 (UTC).

PNC Bank, National Association v. Cisco Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 PNC Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cisco Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04724

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Bank National Association

Defendant

Cisco Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D. Farrell

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Cheryl A. Kelly

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Jeffrey N. Brown

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2029 Century Park East, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew W. Blackwell

Attorney at CAPES SOKOL PC

8182 Maryland Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63105

R. Thomas Avery

Attorney at CAPES SOKOL PC

8182 Maryland Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thomas A. Burg

Attorney at Bialson, Bergen & Schwab

633 Menlo Avenue, Suite 300

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cisco Systems Inc re #9 Jury Demand (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cisco Systems Inc. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cisco Systems Inc re #6 Response ( Non Motion ), #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems Inc.. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE re #1 Order Transferring Case,,,, Cisco System, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to PNC Bank, National Association's Second Amended Exceptions and Objections to Garnishment Interrogatories by Cisco Systems Inc. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/17/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PNC Bank National Association.. (Brown, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

2 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00882. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PNC Bank's garnishment claims against Cisco Systems, Inc. are SEVERED from the rest of this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to establish a new docket number for the resulting case, to docket this Memorandum and Order as the first entry in the newly created case, and to attach all documents filed in this case up to the date of this Memorandum and Order to that first docket entry. The plaintiff in the newly created case is PNC Bank, National Association. The defendant in the newly created case is Cisco Systems, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cisco Systems, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. 45) is GRANTED, and the newly created case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case to be transferred after 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on July 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM)(MCB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cisco Systems Inc re #9 Jury Demand (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cisco Systems Inc. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cisco Systems Inc re #6 Response ( Non Motion ), #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems Inc.. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE re #1 Order Transferring Case,,,, Cisco System, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to PNC Bank, National Association's Second Amended Exceptions and Objections to Garnishment Interrogatories by Cisco Systems Inc. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/17/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PNC Bank National Association.. (Brown, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00882. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PNC Bank's garnishment claims against Cisco Systems, Inc. are SEVERED from the rest of this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to establish a new docket number for the resulting case, to docket this Memorandum and Order as the first entry in the newly created case, and to attach all documents filed in this case up to the date of this Memorandum and Order to that first docket entry. The plaintiff in the newly created case is PNC Bank, National Association. The defendant in the newly created case is Cisco Systems, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cisco Systems, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. 45) is GRANTED, and the newly created case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case to be transferred after 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on July 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM)(MCB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Neal Brown