This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 13:24:22 (UTC).

PNC Bank, National Association v. Cisco Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 PNC Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cisco Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shirley Padmore Mensah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shirley Padmore Mensah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Bank, National Association

Defendant

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D. Farrell

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Cheryl A. Kelly

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew W. Blackwell

Attorney at CAPES SOKOL PC

8182 Maryland Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63105

R. Thomas Avery

Attorney at CAPES SOKOL PC

8182 Maryland Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thomas A. Burg

Attorney at BIALSON BERGEN

633 Menlo Ave, Suite 100, Suite 100

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PNC Bank's garnishment claims against Cisco Systems, Inc. are SEVERED from the rest of this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to establish a new docket number for the resulting case, to docket this Memorandum and Order as the first entry in the newly created case, and to attach all documents filed in this case up to the date of this Memorandum and Order to that first docket entry. The plaintiff in the newly created case is PNC Bank, National Association. The defendant in the newly created case is Cisco Systems, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cisco Systems, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. 45) is GRANTED, and the newly created case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case to be transferred after 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on July 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM)(MCB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-04724. (KXS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket***REMARK - California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-04724, filed 07/15/2020. (MCB) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket***REMARK - Case was electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (MCB) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: United States District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PNC Bank's garnishment claims against Cisco Systems, Inc. are SEVERED from the rest of this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to establish a new docket number for the resulting case, to docket this Memorandum and Order as the first entry in the newly created case, and to attach all documents filed in this case up to the date of this Memorandum and Order to that first docket entry. The plaintiff in the newly created case is PNC Bank, National Association. The defendant in the newly created case is Cisco Systems, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cisco Systems, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. 45) is GRANTED, and the newly created case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case to be transferred after 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on July 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet and documents from 4:18CV1967 SPM)(MCB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant