This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 11:25:44 (UTC).

PNC Bank, National Association v. Bruggeworth et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 PNC Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bruggeworth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Bank, National Association

Defendants

Scott M. Bruggeworth

Annika M. Bruggeworth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John T. McGarvey

Attorney at Morgan Pottinger McGravey, P.S.C. - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

Roger Benjamin Crittenden

Attorney at Morgan & Pottinger, P.S.C. - Lexington

175 E. Main Street, Suite 200

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCOMPLETE document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; No signature applied to the Entry of Default re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default; Correct document attached to this entry. *TDA* cc: COR (JJ) Modified on 2/2/2022 (JJ). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Annika M. Bruggeworth. cc: COR, Dft Annika Bruggeworth via US Mail (JJ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/2/2022) (TDA). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

7 #2

Proposed Order - Clerk's Entry of Default

7 #1

Affidavit of Counsel for Plaintiff

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint by the Anderson County Sheriff's office served on Annika Bruggeworth on 12/28/2021, filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (McGarvey, John) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association via Certified Mail to Annika M. Bruggeworth served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (McGarvey, John) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

3 #1

Summons - Scott Bruggeworth

#3

1 #10

Summons Anikka Bruggeworth

1 #9

Summons Scott Bruggeworth

1 #7

Exhibit F - $701,544.79 Amended & Restated Term Note

1 #5

Exhibit D - $220,954.37 Amended & Restated Term Note

1 #4

Exhibit C - $97,420.03 Amended & Restated Term Note

1 #3

Exhibit B - Commercial Guaranties

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCOMPLETE document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; No signature applied to the Entry of Default re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default; Correct document attached to this entry. *TDA* cc: COR (JJ) Modified on 2/2/2022 (JJ). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Annika M. Bruggeworth. cc: COR, Dft Annika Bruggeworth via US Mail (JJ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/2/2022) (TDA). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Entry of Default by PNC Bank, National Association Against Annika M. Bruggeworth (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel for Plaintiff, #2 Proposed Order - Clerk's Entry of Default)(McGarvey, John) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint by the Anderson County Sheriff's office served on Annika Bruggeworth on 12/28/2021, filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (McGarvey, John) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association via Certified Mail to Annika M. Bruggeworth served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (McGarvey, John) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PNC Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent PNC Bancorp, Inc. for PNC Bank, National Association.. (CBD) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons - Scott Bruggeworth)(CBD) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5047050), filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - Commercial Guaranties, #4 Exhibit C - $97,420.03 Amended & Restated Term Note, #5 Exhibit D - $220,954.37 Amended & Restated Term Note, #6 Exhibit E - $418,109.00 Amended & Restated Term Note, #7 Exhibit F - $701,544.79 Amended & Restated Term Note, #8 Exhibit G - Amended & Restated Guaranties & Suretyship Agreements, #9 Summons Scott Bruggeworth, #10 Summons Anikka Bruggeworth)(CBD) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger Benjamin Crittenden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T. McGarvey(Designation Retained)