This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 09:05:15 (UTC).

PMC, INC. v. TOMCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 PMC, INC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against TOMCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-13470

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

PMC, INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

TOMCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC.

MATTHEW MAURO

ABC COMPANIES 1-100

Cross Claimants, Counter Claimants and Defendants

EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC.

MATTHEW MAURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

JARED PAUL DUVOISIN

Attorney at TOMPKINS, MCGUIRE, WACHENFELD & BARRY, LLP

3 Becker Farm Roadsuite 402

Roseland, NJ 07068

JOSEPH KENNETH COBUZIO

Attorney at TOMPKINS, MCGUIRE, WACHENFELD & BARRY, LLP

Four Gateway Center100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Cross Claimant, Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD S. RANIERI

Attorney at WEBER GALLAGHER SIMPSON STAPLETON FIRES & NEWBY, LLP

20 Independence Boulevardsuite 201

Warren, NJ 07059

ANTHONY T. LING

Attorney at WEBER GALLAGHER

20 Independence Boulevardsuite 201

Warren, NJ 07059

 

Court Documents

17 #3

Text of Proposed Order

17 #2

Brief in Support of Motion for Leave

17 #1

Certification in Support of Motion for Leave

17 #17

Main Document

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit A to Second Amended Answer

13 #1

Certification in support of opposition

13 #13

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply. Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC., MATTHEW MAURO. (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by PMC, INC. re #9 MOTION to Remand (DUVOISIN, JARED) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Exhibit to #13 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC., MATTHEW MAURO. (RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Exhibit to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC., MATTHEW MAURO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Second Amended Answer)(RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF in Opposition filed by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC., MATTHEW MAURO re #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certification in support of opposition)(RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First CROSSCLAIM against TOMCO CONSTRUCTION, INC., First COUNTERCLAIM against PMC, INC. by MATTHEW MAURO, EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC., MATTHEW MAURO. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint, #2 Certification in Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Text of Proposed Order for Leave to File Third Party Complaint)(RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand by PMC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DUVOISIN, JARED) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/30/2021. (jr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ANTHONY T. LING terminated. Attorney RICHARD S. RANIERI for EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC.,RICHARD S. RANIERI for MATTHEW MAURO added.. (RANIERI, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MATTHEW MAURO.(LING, ANTHONY) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (LING, ANTHONY) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(LING, ANTHONY) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PMC, INC.. (DUVOISIN, JARED) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JARED PAUL DUVOISIN on behalf of PMC, INC. (DUVOISIN, JARED) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MATTHEW MAURO, EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, case number HUD-L-4941-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12616315), filed by MATTHEW MAURO, EXCEL ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LING, ANTHONY) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY T. LING