This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 11:28:25 (UTC).

Clough v. Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Clough filed an Other lawsuit against Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Robert W. Clough, II

Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation

Avenge Digital, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger B. Phillips

Attorney at Phillips Law Office

104 Pleasant St

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony Paronich

#5

(#5) MOTION for Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967950.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony Paronich)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Edward A. Broderick

#4

(#4) MOTION for Edward A. Broderick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967945.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Edward A. Broderick)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Alex Washkowitz

#3

(#3) MOTION for Alex Washkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967925.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Alex Washkowitz)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

2 #1

Notice ECF

#2

(#2) Summonses issued electronically as to Avenge Digital, LLC, Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

1 #2

Summons - Waiver

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1952919 filed by Robert W. Clough, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Alex Washkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Edward A. Broderick to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967950.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony Paronich)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Edward A. Broderick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967945.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Edward A. Broderick)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Alex Washkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1967925.) filed by Robert W. Clough, II.Follow up on Objection on 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Alex Washkowitz)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses issued electronically as to Avenge Digital, LLC, Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-345-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1952919 filed by Robert W. Clough, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less