This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 07:54:09 (UTC).

PlusPass, Inc. v. Verra Mobility Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 PlusPass, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Verra Mobility Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10078

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PlusPass, Inc.

Defendants

Verra Mobility Corp.

Platinum Equity LLC

The Gores Group LLC

ATS Processing Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna M Fuller

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

633 West Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Danielle J. Healey

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77010

Joanna M. Fuller

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

633 West Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

John S Gibson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

2000 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

Julie Ann Gryce

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

401 B Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Chelsea Dal Corso

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

David Ramraj Singh

Attorney at Weil Gotshal and Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065-1134

Eric A Rivas

Attorney at Weil Gotshal and Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway 4Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Gores Group LLC, identifying Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Corporation, Argonaut Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc.. (Singh, David) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#24

(#24) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Verra Mobility Corp., (Dal Corso, Chelsea) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-10078 SB(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#21

(#21) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Verra Mobility Corp.. (Gibson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Platinum Equity LLC, (Brass, Rachel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Verra Mobility Corp., ATS Processing Services, Inc.. upon All Plaintiffs. Waiver of Service signed by John S. Gibson. (Gibson, John) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Defendants shall have until January 25, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (hr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc., (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Platinum Equity LLC, The Gores Group LLC, Verra Mobility Corp. (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

4 #1

CV11C

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Gores Group LLC, identifying Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Corporation, Argonaut Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Ironshore Indemnity Inc.. (Singh, David) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Verra Mobility Corp., (Dal Corso, Chelsea) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-10078 SB(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Verra Mobility Corp.. (Gibson, John) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Platinum Equity LLC, (Brass, Rachel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Verra Mobility Corp., ATS Processing Services, Inc.. upon All Plaintiffs. Waiver of Service signed by John S. Gibson. (Gibson, John) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Defendants shall have until January 25, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (hr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 25, 2021 filed by Defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Verra Mobility Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, John) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle J. Healey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29135254) filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc., (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants ATS Processing Services, Inc., Platinum Equity LLC, The Gores Group LLC, Verra Mobility Corp. (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28824547 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff PlusPass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joanna M Fuller added to party PlusPass, Inc.(pty:pla))(Fuller, Joanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gore is a litigant

Latest cases where Platinum Equity LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle Joy Healey