This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 06:15:52 (UTC).

Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01470

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust

Petitioners

Frederic Lou

Charles Tebele

Menora Mivtachim Insurance Ltd.

Menora Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd.

The Phoenix Insurance Company

The Phoenix Provident Pension Fund Ltd.

KBC Asset Management NV

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Mark Zuckerberg

David Wehner

Sheryl Sandberg

Susan Li

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Matthew Wagstaffe

Attorney at Wagstaffe, Von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 2250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Eric J. Belfi

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Francis P. McConville

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Christopher J. Keller

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Frank Busch

Attorney at Wagstaffe, von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 2250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Petitioner Attorneys

Adam Marc Apton

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

75 Broadway, Suite 202

San Francisco, CA 94111

Charles Henry Linehan

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Austin Van

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Avenue, Floor 20

New York, NY 10016

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue, 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

J Alexander Hood, II

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jeremy A. Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

David Reuven Lev Kaplan

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

12750 High Bluff Drive, Suite 475

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth L. Deeley

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Melanie Marilyn Blunschi

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Brian Clubok

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Susan E. Engel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #53 JOINT STIPULATION SETTING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULE. Amended Complaint due by 8/2/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 9/20/2022. Response due by 11/9/2022. Reply due by 12/16/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

53 #1

Declaration of Austin P. Van

53 #53

Main Document

#52

(#52) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

51 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

51 #51

Main Document

#50

(#50) ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVING SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#49

(#49) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #43 STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE OR ADJOURN MOTION HEARING. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#43

(#49) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #43 STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE OR ADJOURN MOTION HEARING. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#8

(#9) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendants Susan Li, Meta Platforms, Inc., Sheryl Sandberg, David Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-15 filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust re #1 Complaint (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

77 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #53 JOINT STIPULATION SETTING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULE. Amended Complaint due by 8/2/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 9/20/2022. Response due by 11/9/2022. Reply due by 12/16/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULE filed by Menora Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menora Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd., The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Phoenix Provident Pension Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Austin P. Van)(Van, Austin) (Filed on 6/21/2022) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17250828) filed by Menora Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menora Mivtachim Pensions and Gemel Ltd., The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Phoenix Provident Pension Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Van, Austin) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVING SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #43 STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE OR ADJOURN MOTION HEARING. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #40 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; and Approval of Selection of Counsel; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Frederic Lou. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/23/2022. Replies due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Apton, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C - PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Lou Decl., #6 Exhibit E - LK Resume, #7 Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 5/9/2022) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17037938) filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust. (McConville, Francis) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust re Notice of Publication Pursuant to Local Rule 23-1(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendants Susan Li, Meta Platforms, Inc., Sheryl Sandberg, David Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-15 filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust re #1 Complaint (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Susan Li, Meta Platforms, Inc., Sheryl Sandberg, David Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16972090). Filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/8/2022) Modified on 3/9/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where KBC Asset Management N.V. is a litigant