This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2020 at 07:54:52 (UTC).

Plumber v. M.I.N.T. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Plumber filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against M I N T. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13498

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colby Plumber

Mt. Pleasnat, MI 48858

Defendants

Dana Mattice

John Rogers

Michigan State Police

M.I.N.T.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Colby Plumber against M.I.N.T., Dana Mattice, Michigan State Police, John Rogers (AFla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Colby Plumber. (AFla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Colby Plumber. (AFla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Colby Plumber against M.I.N.T., Dana Mattice, Michigan State Police, John Rogers (AFla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.