This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:51:17 (UTC).

Plotch v. US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Plotch filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06078

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Plotch

Defendant

US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Filosa

Attorney at Rosenberg, Fortuna & Laitman

666 Old Country Road

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Robert Bailey

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) . (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 (Bailey, Robert) Modified, changed to motion on 12/2/2021 (Marino, Janine). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bailey on behalf of US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 (aty to be noticed) (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss Defendant's intent to file a Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) motion by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss Defendant's intent to file a Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) motion by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bailey on behalf of US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 (aty to be noticed) (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/2/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 (Bailey, Robert) Modified, changed to motion on 12/2/2021 (Marino, Janine). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) . (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Asset Backed Funding Corporation, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE1 filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14989293 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Adam Plotch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Filosa, Anthony) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant