This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 07:15:51 (UTC).

Plexico v. American National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Plexico filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-03674

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald David Plexico, Jr

Defendant

American National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Whitney Boyd

Attorney at James W Boyd Law Firm LLC

Po Box 36425

Rock Hill, SC 29732

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer E Johnsen

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 10589

Greenville, SC 29603

Natalie Rae Ecker

Attorney at Gallivan White Boyd (Gre)

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S RES

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE the Court intends to treat Defendant's motion as one for summary judgment under Rule 56. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of this order to supplement his prior response to present all the material that is pertinent to the motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American National Insurance Company, ( Response to Motion due by 12/20/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/6/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by American National Insurance Company. (Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

10 #1

Memo in Support RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

10 #10

Main Document

9 #2

Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Musselman

9 #1

Memo in Support

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronald David Plexico, Jr.(Boyd, James) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit Signed Acknowledgement of the State Court Clerk of Court of Notice of Re

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit A-Signed Letter Granting Extension of Time

6 #6

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as requested in #12 Order, re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/19/22.(mflo, ) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Ronald David Plexico, Jr. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS)No proposed order.(Boyd, James) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE the Court intends to treat Defendant's motion as one for summary judgment under Rule 56. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of this order to supplement his prior response to present all the material that is pertinent to the motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American National Insurance Company, ( Response to Motion due by 12/20/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/6/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by American National Insurance Company. (Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Ronald David Plexico, Jr.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/5/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Boyd, James) (Entered: 11/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American National Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Musselman)No proposed order.(Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronald David Plexico, Jr.(Boyd, James) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for York County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgement of the State Court Clerk of Court of Notice of Removal)(Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER American National Insurance Company answer due 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Signed Letter Granting Extension of Time)(Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(Johnsen, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Insurance Company.(mflo, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-46-2089. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10762524), filed by American National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mflo, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less