This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:51:33 (UTC).

Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC. v. DNS Perfume Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DNS Perfume Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01573

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC.

Defendants

Sylvi Bitton

Elegance Perfume TX Inc.

Elegance Perfume TN Incorporated

Elegance Perfume NYC Inc.

Avraham Vahnounou

DNS Perfume Inc.

AVI Perfumes Inc.

Scentsual Perfume Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosamar Garcia-Fontan

Attorney at MCCONNELL VALDES

2023 Carr 177

Guaynabo, PR 00969

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Summons in a Civil Action

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to AVI Perfumes Inc., Avraham Vahnounou, DNS Perfume Inc., Elegance Perfume NYC Inc., Elegance Perfume TN Incorporated, Elegance Perfume TX Inc., Scentsual Perfume Inc., Sylvi Bitton. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

2 #7

Summons Silvy

2 #6

Summons Avraham

2 #5

Summons Elegance TX

2 #4

Summons Scentsual

2 #3

Summons Elegance NYC

2 #2

Summons AVI

2 #1

Summons Elegance TN

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Elegance TN, #2 Summons AVI, #3 Summons Elegance NYC, #4 Summons Scentsual, #5 Summons Elegance TX, #6 Summons Avraham, #7 Summons Silvy) (Garcia-Fontan, Rosamar) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #10

Category Sheet Category Sheet

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to AVI Perfumes Inc., Avraham Vahnounou, DNS Perfume Inc., Elegance Perfume NYC Inc., Elegance Perfume TN Incorporated, Elegance Perfume TX Inc., Scentsual Perfume Inc., Sylvi Bitton. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Elegance TN, #2 Summons AVI, #3 Summons Elegance NYC, #4 Summons Scentsual, #5 Summons Elegance TX, #6 Summons Avraham, #7 Summons Silvy) (Garcia-Fontan, Rosamar) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6450837.), filed by Plaza Internacional Puerto Rico LLC.. Service due by 9/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Garcia-Fontan, Rosamar) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.