This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 07:12:18 (UTC).

Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. v. Automated Data Processing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Automated Data Processing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel E. Butcher and William Q. Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01352

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

Presiding Judge

William Q. Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 20

Automated Data Processing, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as ADP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D Alessio

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch

525 B Street, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Sean Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Zagros Bassirian

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street, Suite 2200, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Twenty-Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Automated Data Processing, Inc. (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/31/2020. (ag) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

13 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Notice of Motion a

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Duffy, Joseph) (jdt). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#12

(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Automated Data Processing, Inc., filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ag). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., Other Affiliate ADP, Inc., Other Affiliate Automated Data Processing Inc. for Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Zagros Bassirian on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bassirian, Zagros)Attorney Zagros Bassirian added to party Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Sullivan on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Sullivan, Sean)Attorney Sean Michael Sullivan added to party Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John D Alessio on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

5 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Duffy, Joseph) (ag). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF PARTY WITH FINANCIAL INTEREST by Automated Data Processing, Inc. (Duffy, Joseph) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy on behalf of Automated Data Processing, Inc. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automated Data Processing, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #9

Proof of Service

1 #8

Exhibit E-3

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00016686-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14171205.), filed by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E-2, #8 Exhibit E-3, #9 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1352-WQH-DEB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Automated Data Processing, Inc. (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/31/2020. (ag) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Duffy, Joseph) (jdt). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Automated Data Processing, Inc., filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ag). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., Other Affiliate ADP, Inc., Other Affiliate Automated Data Processing Inc. for Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Zagros Bassirian on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bassirian, Zagros)Attorney Zagros Bassirian added to party Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Sullivan on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Sullivan, Sean)Attorney Sean Michael Sullivan added to party Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John D Alessio on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Alessio, John) (jpp). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Duffy, Joseph) (ag). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PARTY WITH FINANCIAL INTEREST by Automated Data Processing, Inc. (Duffy, Joseph) (ag). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy on behalf of Automated Data Processing, Inc. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automated Data Processing, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00016686-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14171205.), filed by Automated Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E-2, #8 Exhibit E-3, #9 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1352-WQH-DEB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plaza Home Mortgage Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOMATIC DATA PROCESSING, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Alessio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Michael Sullivan