This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 07:19:14 (UTC).

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY v. PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01556

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Platte River Insurance Company

Defendants

Lamar Toland

Derrick S Sieber

Precision Contracting Solutions LP

Catherine L Miller

PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP

DERRICK S. SIEBER

CATHERINE L. MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander B. Kahn

Attorney at PIKE & GILLISS, LLC

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 303

Towson, MD 21204

Joel Peter Williams

Attorney at PIKE & GILLISS, LLC

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 303

Towson, MD 21204

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Alan Vogel

Attorney at BAR-ADON & VOGEL, PLLC

1642 R Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Edward West Lyle

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF EDWARD W. LYLE

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Alexander Kahn) by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Peter Williams on behalf of PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Joel) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

6 #2

Declaration

#12

(#12) REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay, #11 MOTION for Leave to File filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

12 #1

Declaration

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward) Modified event title on 7/10/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case by LAMAR TOLAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Kenneth); Modified event and text on 6/26/2019 (tth). Added MOTION to Stay on 6/26/2019 (tth). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

7 #1

Exhibit

11 #1

Memorandum in Support

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyle, Edward) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

11 #2

Declaration

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#9

(#9) Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Alexander Kahn) by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Peter Williams on behalf of PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Joel) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay, #11 MOTION for Leave to File filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward) Modified event title on 7/10/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LAMAR TOLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Transfer Case by LAMAR TOLAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Kenneth); Modified event and text on 6/26/2019 (tth). Added MOTION to Stay on 6/26/2019 (tth). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyle, Edward) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alan Vogel on behalf of LAMAR TOLAND (Vogel, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CATHERINE L. MILLER served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; DERRICK S. SIEBER served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; LAMAR TOLAND served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CATHERINE L. MILLER, PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP, DERRICK S. SIEBER, LAMAR TOLAND. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Platte River Insurance Company (Kahn, Alexander) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT in the nature of interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148105) filed by Platte River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sieber, #3 Summons Precision, #4 Summons Miller, #5 Summons Toland, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G)(Kahn, Alexander) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/31/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.