This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:48:11 (UTC).

Plastipak Packaging, Inc. v. Premium Waters, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Plastipak Packaging, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Premium Waters, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plastipak Packaging, Inc.

Defendant

Premium Waters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701-2719

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Michael Gross

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60654-4762

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#6

(#6) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

1 #16

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

1 #15

Summons

1 #14

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit 13 - Plastipak 12-17-2019 Letter to Premium Waters

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 10,457,437

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 10,266,299

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,312

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,311

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. 10,023,345

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 9,850,019

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,738,409

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 9,403,310

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,033,168

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,857,637

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Premium Waters, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2621105.), filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,857,637, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,033,168, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 9,139,326, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 9,403,310, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 9,522,759, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,738,409, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 9,850,019, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. 10,023,345, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,311, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,312, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 10,266,299, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 10,457,437, #13 Exhibit 13 - Plastipak 12-17-2019 Letter to Premium Waters, #14 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons, #16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Premium Waters, Inc. answer due 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/18/2020. (kwf) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gross, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Premium Waters, Inc. served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (rks) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Premium Waters, Inc. (rks) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Plastipak Packaging, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Premium Waters, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2621105.), filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,857,637, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,033,168, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 9,139,326, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 9,403,310, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 9,522,759, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 9,738,409, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 9,850,019, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. 10,023,345, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,311, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 10,214,312, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 10,266,299, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 10,457,437, #13 Exhibit 13 - Plastipak 12-17-2019 Letter to Premium Waters, #14 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons, #16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less