This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 09:13:59 (UTC).

Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlton W. Reeves and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC

Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S. Craig Panter

Attorney at PANTER LAW FIRM, PLLC

7736 Old Canton Road, Suite B, P. O. Box 2310 (39139)

Madison, MS 39110

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R. Bush

Attorney at COPELAND, COOK, TAYLOR & BUSH, PA - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6020

600 Concourse, SU 200

Alexandra L. Gjertson - PHV

Attorney at BARRASSO, USDIN, KUPPERMAN, FREEMAN & SARVER, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

John W. Joyce - PHV

Attorney at BARRASSO, USDIN, KUPPERMAN, FREEMAN & SARVER, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Steven W. Usdin - PHV

Attorney at BARRASSO, USDIN, KUPPERMAN, FREEMAN & SARVER, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#16

(#16) ***ERROR***Error disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) Modified on 3/8/2022 (cwl). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 8/30/2022 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 5/30/2022; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 6/29/2022 ; Motions due by 9/13/2022; Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 12/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 2/23/22 (NL) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Federal Insurance Company.(Joyce - PHV, John) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Joyce - PHV, John) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

(#11) State Court Record by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Bush, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Federal Insurance Company answer due 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/19/2022 (BB) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (NL) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Excerpts of Insurance Policy

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Record

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #16 : Incorrect court and case number. Error disregard this entry. (cwl) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***ERROR***Error disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) Modified on 3/8/2022 (cwl). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Plastic Surgical Center of Mississippi, LLC (Panter, S.) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 8/30/2022 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 5/30/2022; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 6/29/2022 ; Motions due by 9/13/2022; Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 12/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 2/23/22 (NL) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/23/2022. Participants: S. Craig Panter, Jason Bush, Alexandra L. Gjertson and John W. Joyce. The court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (NL) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Federal Insurance Company.(Joyce - PHV, John) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Joyce - PHV, John) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) State Court Record by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Bush, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorneys, John W. Joyce, Alexandra L. Gjertson and Steven W. Usdin, be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Federal Insurance Company, in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/20/22 (NL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Alexandra L. Gjertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bush, Jason) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for John W. Joyce to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bush, Jason) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to Doc # [4,5 and 6] Attorney advises that there is an error in these entries, and they should be disregarded. Attorney is directed to refile Motions. (PG) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Federal Insurance Company answer due 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/19/2022 (BB) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.MOTION for Steven W. Usdin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4746690) by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bush, Jason) Modified on 1/19/2022 (PG). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ****ERROR***Disregard this entry.MOTION for Alexandra L. Gjertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4746685) by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bush, Jason) Modified on 1/19/2022 (PG). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***ERROR***Disregard this entry.MOTION for John W. Joyce to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4746674) by Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bush, Jason) Modified on 1/19/2022 (PG). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Federal Insurance Company (Bush, Jason) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (NL) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Insurance Company from Rankin County Circuit Court, case number 61CI1:21-cv-00256-JA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4743805) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint)(PG) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant