This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2019 at 07:36:28 (UTC).

Plant Health Intermediate, Inc. v. Campbell et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Plant Health Intermediate, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Campbell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plant Health Intermediate, Inc.

Defendants

Nicole Campbell

Clare Reinbergen

Rupert Campbell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John K. Power

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - KCMO

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112-2551

James R Montgomery

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - KCMO

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112-2551

Defendant Attorneys

David R. McCourt

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Timothy J Wolf

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Return of Service unexecuted by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc. as to Rupert Campbell. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) Return of Service unexecuted by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc. as to Nicole Campbell. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc.. Clare Reinbergen served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) NOTICE of filing of Orders Entered in the First-Filed Action Bearing on the Parties Here by Clare Reinbergen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Motion to allow David R. McCourt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6378187) filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen. (Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of appearance by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen (Attorney Timothy J Wolf added to party Clare Reinbergen(pty:dft))(Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John K. Power on behalf of Plant Health Intermediate, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6347511. Service due by 9/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Power, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service unexecuted by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc. as to Rupert Campbell. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service unexecuted by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc. as to Nicole Campbell. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Plant Health Intermediate, Inc.. Clare Reinbergen served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Power, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of filing of Orders Entered in the First-Filed Action Bearing on the Parties Here by Clare Reinbergen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS REISSUED as to Nicole Campbell, Rupert Campbell. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David R. McCourt for Clare Reinbergen allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to allow David R. McCourt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6378187) filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen. (Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of appearance by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Clare Reinbergen (Attorney Timothy J Wolf added to party Clare Reinbergen(pty:dft))(Wolf, Timothy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicole Campbell, Rupert Campbell, Clare Reinbergen. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John K. Power on behalf of Plant Health Intermediate, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6347511. Service due by 9/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Power, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John K. Power(Designation Retained)