Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 07:44:59 (UTC).

Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region et al v. Yost et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Yost. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan J. Dlott and Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan J. Dlott

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio

M.D. Sharon Liner

Women's Med Group Professional Corporation

Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region

Defendants

Ronald O'Brien

Michael O'Malley

Mathias Heck, Jr.

David Yost

Joseph Deters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein

Attorney at Gerhardstein & Branch Co. LPA

441 Vine Street, Suite 3400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jennifer Lynn Branch

Attorney at Gerhardstein & Branch Co. LPA

441 Vine Street, Suite 3400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Richard Muniz

Attorney at Planned Parenthood Federation of America

1110 Vermont Ave Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Allyson T. Slater

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 45202

Felicia H. Ellsworth

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Alan E. Schoenfeld

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich St.

New York, NY 10007

Melissa A. Cohen

Attorney at Planned Parenthood Federation of America

123 William St., Fl. 9

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Nick A Soulas, Jr

Attorney at Franklin County Prosecutor's Office

373 S High Street, 13Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Amy L Hiers

Attorney at Franklin County Prosecutor's Office

373 South High Street, 13Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Arthur James Marziale, Jr.

Attorney at Franklin County Prosecuting Attorney

373 South High Street, 13Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Mary E Montgomery

Attorney at Montgomery County Prosecutors Office

301 W. Third Street, 5Th Floor

Dayton, OH 45422

Ann Yackshaw

Attorney at Ohio Attorney Generals Office

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel Richard Forsythe

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

150 E Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Tiffany L. Carwile

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General

30 E. Broad St., 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Michael Gerard Florez

Attorney at Assistant Prosecutor, Hamilton County Ohio

230 East Ninth Street, Suite 4000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Pamela J Sears

Attorney at Hamilton County Prosecutor

230 East Ninth Street, Suite 4000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

James J. Barbiere

Attorney at Hamilton County Prosecuting Attorney's Office

230 E. 9Th Street, Suite 4000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

43 #1

Exhibit List

#43

(#43) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; counsel present; witness testimony heard; parties have until 11:59 pm on 4/15/19 to file their findings of facts/conclusions of law; defendants' answer date is extended by 7 days; Court's order to follow. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (ba) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#42

(#42) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing (Day 2) held on 4/11/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; counsel present; witness testimony heard; Court in recess until 4/12/19 at 8:30 am. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (ba) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/15/19. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

4 #5

Affidavit Jennifer Branch

4 #4

Affidavit W. M. Martin Haskell, MD

4 #3

Affidavit Katherine Rivlin, MD

4 #2

Affidavit Sharon Liner, MD

4 #1

Affidavit Lisa Keder, MD

#4

Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/27/2019; Jennifer Branch, Melissa Cohen, Alison Slater, Richard Muniz and Alan Schoenfeld appeared for Plaintiffs; Tiffany Carwile, Daniel Forsythe and Ann Yackshaw appeared for Defendant; this matter is set for a hearing as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/10/2019 in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett - time to be determined. (ba) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit Alan Schoenfeld Certificate of Good Standing

3 #2

Exhibit Richard Muniz Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Exhibit Melissa Cohen Certificate of Good Standing

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6795381) of Melissa Cohen, Richard Muniz, and Alan Schoenfeld by Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Melissa Cohen Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Richard Muniz Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Alan Schoenfeld Certificate of Good Standing) (Branch, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein for Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A. S.B. 145

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6795335), filed by Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. S.B. 145) (Branch, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; counsel present; witness testimony heard; parties have until 11:59 pm on 4/15/19 to file their findings of facts/conclusions of law; defendants' answer date is extended by 7 days; Court's order to follow. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (ba) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing (Day 2) held on 4/11/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; counsel present; witness testimony heard; Court in recess until 4/12/19 at 8:30 am. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (ba) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Day 1); witness testimony heard; Court in recess until 4/11/19 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter: Julie Wolfer) (ba) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allyson Slater for Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/9/19. (ba) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 4/9/2019; Jennifer Branch, Sara Schaumburg, Felicia Ellsworth, Melissa Cohen and Richard Muniz appeared for Plaintiffs; Tiffany Carwile, Daniel Forsythe and Ann Yackshaw appeared for Defendants; the format for the hearing re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction was discussed with Court; the hearing will commence 4/10/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (ba) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6869812) of Allyson Slater by Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Allyson Slater Certificate of Good Standing) (Branch, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Felicia H. Ellsworth for Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/3/19. (ba) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER extending #34 Temporary Restraining Order until 4/18/19. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/2/19. (ba) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Transcript of Proceedings, Motion Hearing held on March 19, 2019, before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maryann T. Maffia, Telephone number 513-564-7677. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 4/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2019. (Maffia, Maryann) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/27/2019; Jennifer Branch, Melissa Cohen, Alison Slater, Richard Muniz and Alan Schoenfeld appeared for Plaintiffs; Tiffany Carwile, Daniel Forsythe and Ann Yackshaw appeared for Defendant; this matter is set for a hearing as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/10/2019 in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett - time to be determined. (ba) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L. Carwile for Defendant David Yost (Carwile, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Nick A Soulas, Jr for Defendant Ronald O'Brien (Soulas, Nick) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L Hiers for Defendant Ronald O'Brien (Hiers, Amy) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur James Marziale, Jr for Defendant Ronald O'Brien (Marziale, Arthur) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Yackshaw for Defendant David Yost (Yackshaw, Ann) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/15/19. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lisa Keder, MD, #2 Affidavit Sharon Liner, MD, #3 Affidavit Katherine Rivlin, MD, #4 Affidavit W. M. Martin Haskell, MD, #5 Affidavit Jennifer Branch) (Branch, Jennifer). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 2/15/2019 (bjc). (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6795381) of Melissa Cohen, Richard Muniz, and Alan Schoenfeld by Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Melissa Cohen Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Richard Muniz Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Alan Schoenfeld Certificate of Good Standing) (Branch, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein for Plaintiffs Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6795335), filed by Sharon Liner, Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio, Planned Parenthood Southwest Ohio Region, Women's Med Group Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. S.B. 145) (Branch, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Planned Parenthood of Greater Ohio is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alphonse A. Gerhardstein