This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2020 at 07:35:13 (UTC).

Planck v. Saul

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Planck filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01463

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason S. Planck

Schenectady, NY 12304

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jessica Tucker

Attorney at Social Security Administration

J.F.K. Federal Building, Room 625, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) DECISION and ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #6 Letter Request for a conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/27/2019. (Copy served upon Plaintiff via regular mail)(amt) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECISION and ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #6 Letter Request for a conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/27/2019. (Copy served upon Plaintiff via regular mail)(amt) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Saul re 9 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Tucker, Jessica) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Tucker appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 2/24/2020. (Tucker, Jessica) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES and NOTICE issued and explained to Jason S. Planck at time complaint was filed (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter Motion filed by Jason S. Planck requesting conference submitted to Judge Baxter. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason S. Planck. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Jason S. Planck advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason S. Planck. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.