This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 18:08:48 (UTC).

Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan v. Johnson

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan

Defendant

Valerie L. Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick R Martin

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

225 South Sixth Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Eric Peter Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

56 S Washington St Ste 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

Defendant Attorney

Barry A O'Neil

Attorney at Lommen Abdo, PA

1000 International Centre, 920 Second Avenue South

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit(s) A, Preliminary Injunction Order

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, Preliminary Injunction Order)(Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. Valerie L. Johnson waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric P. Mathisen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7694644 filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1052 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/4/2020.(KDS) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Valerie L. Johnson. (KDS) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1-5

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against Valerie L. Johnson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7687180) filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, Preliminary Injunction Order)(Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. Valerie L. Johnson waiver sent on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Peter Mathisen for Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/5/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric P. Mathisen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7694644 filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1052 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/4/2020.(KDS) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Valerie L. Johnson. (KDS) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1052 JRT/ECW. (KDS) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against Valerie L. Johnson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7687180) filed by Plan Administrator of 3M Employee Retirement Income Plan. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick R Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric P. Mathisen