This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 08:01:33 (UTC).

Plaintiff Unknown v. Defendant Unknown

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Plaintiff Unknown filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Defendant Unknown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01206

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plaintiff Unknown

Defendant

Defendant Unknown

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

mohammad m rahman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Gordon Price Diefenbach

Attorney at Diefenbach PLLC

888 Seventh Avenue, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10106

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 4/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 4/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gordon Price Diefenbach to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 2/13/2019. (sj) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.