This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 07:51:27 (UTC).

Plainsmen Energy Inc v. SK Nemaha LLC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Plainsmen Energy Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against SK Nemaha LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Scott L. Palk

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plainsmen Energy Inc

Defendant

SK Nemaha LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Kelly Puls

Attorney at Puls Haney Lyster PLLC

301 Commerce St, Suite 2900

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsey E Albers

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

Kerry R Lewis

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 @10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. (wh) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plainsmen Energy Inc. (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Plainsmen Energy Inc . (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by William Kelly Puls on behalf of Plainsmen Energy Inc (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by SK Nemaha LLC.(Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SK Nemaha LLC . (Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/8/2020. (md) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsey E Albers on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Albers, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit 5- Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4- EOA

1 #3

Exhibit 3- EOA

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Garfield County, case number CJ-2020-183-02 filed by SK Nemaha LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- EOA, #4 Exhibit 4- EOA, #5 Exhibit 5- Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Plainsmen Energy Inc. (Puls, William) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 @10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. (wh) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plainsmen Energy Inc. (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Plainsmen Energy Inc . (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by William Kelly Puls on behalf of Plainsmen Energy Inc (Puls, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by SK Nemaha LLC.(Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SK Nemaha LLC . (Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/8/2020. (md) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsey E Albers on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Albers, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3264465. (Lewis, Kerry) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Garfield County, case number CJ-2020-183-02 filed by SK Nemaha LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- EOA, #4 Exhibit 4- EOA, #5 Exhibit 5- Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less