This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2021 at 07:57:08 (UTC).

PLACKO v. FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 PLACKO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00828

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY PLACKO

Defendant

FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. doing business as HAMPTON INN PITTSBURGH/MONROEVILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketUpdate Answer Deadline: Answer due from FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. on 9/28/2021 (cww) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT Waiver of Service of Summons by KIMBERLY PLACKO. Amendment to #6 Waiver of Service Executed. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KIMBERLY PLACKO. FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/29/21. (jg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. (cww) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FIRST HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6583453), filed by KIMBERLY PLACKO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cww) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. Cordes