This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 00:37:49 (UTC).

PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc v. Rich Transport LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Rich Transport LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee P. Rudofsky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Rich Transport LLC

Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John Blume Buzbee

Attorney at Nixon & Light

10201 West Markham Street, Suite 108

Little Rock, AR 72205

John R. Buzbee

Attorney at Attorney at Law

300 Spring Building, Suite 1004

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mary Tipton Thalheimer

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Geoffrey B. Treece

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Thomas Christoph Keller

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

John E. Tull, III

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#15

(#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion,, filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

14 #7

Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

14 #6

Exhibit PKE's Brief in Support

14 #5

Exhibit PKE's Response to Motion to Dismiss

14 #4

Exhibit Defendant's Brief in Support

14 #3

Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

14 #2

Exhibit Email from Shannon Everett

14 #1

Exhibit Transcript

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Email from Shannon Everett, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit PKE's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit PKE's Brief in Support, #7 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#13

(#13) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Buzbee, John) (Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 at the request of the filing attorney.) (thd) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) Defendants' ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion,, filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript, #2 Exhibit Email from Shannon Everett, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit PKE's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit PKE's Brief in Support, #7 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Buzbee, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Notice of Filing. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error, at the request of the filing party. (thd) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Buzbee, John) (Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 at the request of the filing attorney.) (thd) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendants' ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc (Tull, John) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/20/2020 and Bench Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/28/2020. (hml) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer to Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Counterclaim. (thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #4 COUNTERCLAIM filed by by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and COUNTERClAIM by Rich Transport LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc.(thd) (Docket text modified on 4/24/2020 to include a reference to the Counterclaim.) (thd). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by PKE Western Truck Leasing Inc.(thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by all Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-5626. (thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference in case number 4:20MC0001-LPR. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 USDC Docket Sheet for case 4:20MC0001-LPR, #2 USBC Docket Sheet for case 4:19AP01064)(thd) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less