This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 07:48:07 (UTC).

P.K. Schrieffer, LLP v. Great American E&S Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 P K Schrieffer, LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Great American E S Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01346

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

P.K. Schrieffer, LLP

Paul K. Schrieffer

Wayne H. Hammack

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Great American E&S Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christina Anh Ho

Paul K Schrieffer

Leah A Plaskin Lorenz

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Devin Thomas Shoecraft

Robert D Shoecraft

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Counterclaim #22 , Notice (Other) #23 Answer to Counterclaim #24 , by Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata re no. 23; Amended Answer RE no. 24. Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Filer attempted to file "errata" re answer to counterclaim no. 22 which was missing jury demand, but used incorrect events and docket has "2" answers to the counterclaim. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

24 #1

Certificate of Service

#24

(#24) Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

23 #1

Certificate of Service

#23

(#23) Notice of Errata Regarding Answer to Counterclaim (ECF No. 22) filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

22 #1

Certificate of Service

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO MAY 12, 2023 AT 1:00 PM #17 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company, identifying Great American Insurance Company; American Financial Group, Inc.. (Shoecraft, Devin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Cross-Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 5 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Counterclaim #22 , Notice (Other) #23 Answer to Counterclaim #24 , by Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata re no. 23; Amended Answer RE no. 24. Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Filer attempted to file "errata" re answer to counterclaim no. 22 which was missing jury demand, but used incorrect events and docket has "2" answers to the counterclaim. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Errata Regarding Answer to Counterclaim (ECF No. 22) filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Counter-Defendants Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO MAY 12, 2023 AT 1:00 PM #17 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Paul K. Schrieffer answer now due 4/14/2023; Wayne H. Hammack answer now due 4/14/2023; P.K. Schrieffer, LLP answer now due 4/14/2023, re Counterclaim, filed by Cross-Defendants Paul K. Schrieffer; Wayne H. Hammack; P.K. Schrieffer, LLP.(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #16 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken.OTHER: REFER TO CM/ECF no. 18. (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Missing proposed order. Other error(s) with document(s): The event used requires a proposed order. No extension of time to answer cross complaint was recorded. Other error(s) with document(s): RE missing proposed order: As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as a Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Continue scheduling conference from April 14, 2023 to May 12, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #11 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Great American E&S Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shoecraft, Devin) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) (STRICKEN PER 3/15/2023 COURT'S G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 19). STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Cross-Defendant Wayne H. Hammack, P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer.(Attorney Leah A Plaskin Lorenz added to party Wayne H. Hammack(pty:cd), Attorney Leah A Plaskin Lorenz added to party P.K. Schrieffer, LLP(pty:cd), Attorney Leah A Plaskin Lorenz added to party Paul K. Schrieffer(pty:cd))(Plaskin Lorenz, Leah) Modified on 3/15/2023 (lc). (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Counter Claimant Great American E&S Insurance Company, Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company. (Shoecraft, Devin) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 5 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COUNTERCLAIM [FILED AS CROSS-COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT] against Counter Defendants P.K. Schrieffer, LLP, Paul K. Schrieffer, Wayne H. Hammack, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Great American E&S Insurance Company. Filed in State Court on 2/22/2023 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company. Filed in State Court on 2/22/2023 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Great American E&S Insurance Company, filed by Plaintiff P.K. Schrieffer, LLP. Filed in State Court on 1/11/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company, identifying Great American Insurance Company; American Financial Group, Inc.. (Shoecraft, Devin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV00576 Receipt No: ACACDC-34837433 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Great American E&S Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Cross-Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Devin Thomas Shoecraft added to party Great American E&S Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shoecraft, Devin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less