This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:41:31 (UTC).

PIZARRO v. THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 PIZARRO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-13523

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. PIZARRO

Trenton, NJ 08608

Defendants

THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF

DOES 1-10

ROES 1-10

SHERIFF OF MERCER COUNTY OCCUPIED BY SHERIFF JOHN A. KEMLER

SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI

MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF

SHERIFF OF THE COUNTY OF MERCER

JOHN A. KEMLER

MARIO URLA

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Annex A

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Letter

1 #8

Annex D

#4

(#4) Letter regarding service from Pedro J. Pizarro. (km) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

1 #7

Annex C

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of USM (km) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (km) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to MARIO URLA. (km) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application to proceed without payment of fees. It is Ordered that the Clerk shall file the complaint. It is Further Ordered that the USM shall serve the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/11/2019. (km) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Application IFP, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Annex A, #6 Annex B, #7 Annex C, #8 Annex D)(jmh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. JOHN A. KEMLER served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (km) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

1 #6

Annex B

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN A. KEMLER, SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI, THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF, MARIO URLA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #3

Application IFP

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to MARIO URLA. (km) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. JOHN A. KEMLER served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (km) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN A. KEMLER, SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI, THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF, MARIO URLA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of USM (km) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter regarding service from Pedro J. Pizarro. (km) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (km) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT filed, re: docket entry #1 .(km) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application to proceed without payment of fees. It is Ordered that the Clerk shall file the complaint. It is Further Ordered that the USM shall serve the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/11/2019. (km) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Application IFP, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Annex A, #6 Annex B, #7 Annex C, #8 Annex D)(jmh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.