Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:51:19 (UTC).

Pizarro et al v. Astra Flooring Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Pizarro filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Astra Flooring Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08427

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Defendants

York International Corp., individually and as successor in interest to Lillard Co. and Lilco, Inc.

Spirax Sarco, Inc.

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Flowserve US, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation, Edward Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company

Atwood & Morrill Co. Inc. dba Weir Valves and Controls USA Inc.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Crane Co.

FMC Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Northern Pump Company

IMO Industries, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Delaval Turbine Inc. and Sharples Inc.

CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corporation Bendix Aviation Corp., and The Signal Companies, Inc., f/k/a Signal Oil &

General Electric Company

Genuine Parts Company

The Darcoid Company of California

Hill Brothers Chemical Company

Metalclad Insulation, LLC

BW/IP, INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to BRYON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY

Grinnell LLC

Astra Flooring Company

John Crane, Inc.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Elisabet Gage

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

201 Mission Street, Suite 2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Paul M. Bessette

Attorney at Demler, Armstrong & Rowland, LLP

575 Market Street, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94105

Katherine Paige Gardiner

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

Emily Elizabeth Anselmo

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

Derek S. Johnson

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

Francis Dennis Pond

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Dana Leigh Burch

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael A. Graham

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Patrick J. Glinka

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Emily D. Bergstrom

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

Gina Ann Haran

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kevin Douglas Jamison

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin, LLP

825 East 4Th Street, Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Alex Paul Catalona

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

Timothy Carter Pieper

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael J. Pietrykowski

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Kurt Tyler Putnam

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

David Lee Amell

Attorney at Maune, Raichle, Hartley, French and Mudd, LLC

2000 Powell Street, Suite 400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Harrison Scott Smith

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Erin Nicole Empting

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin, LLP

825 East 4Th Street, Unit 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Julie Elizabeth Hayashida

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#70

(#70) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Astra Flooring Company (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#69

(#69) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#68

(#68) NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#67

(#67) NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Haran (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#66

(#66) Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Carbide Corporation (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

57 #4

Declaration of Carlos Guzman with Exhibits

57 #3

Request for Judicial Notice

#57

(#64) REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Remand ) to NASSCO's Opposition filed byMercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California - Contents of Joint Case Management Statement by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#112

(#65) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO DISMISS JOHN CRANE, INC. AND WITHDRAW PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/18/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Astra Flooring Company (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Haran (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Carbide Corporation (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO DISMISS JOHN CRANE, INC. AND WITHDRAW PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/18/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Remand ) to NASSCO's Opposition filed byMercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of John Crane Inc. by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) EXHIBITS re #60 Notice (Other) Attachment to Amended Notice filed byMercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) EXHIBITS re #59 Notice (Other) Attachment to Amended Notice filed byMercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California - Contents of Joint Case Management Statement by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Related Case by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration of P.M. Bessette in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byNational Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Bessette (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of Roger B. Horne, Jr. in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byNational Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company . (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19044035. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14017256). Filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL STEEL AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPIRAX SARCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant