This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:34:50 (UTC).

Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Patrick R. Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Patrick R. Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Morris & Dickson Co., LLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Allergan, PLC

Purdue Frederick Company, The

Insys Therapeutic, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis, PLC

Walgreen Co.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis, LLC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex Yaffe

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

Po Box 2448

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Todd A. Court

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

S. Alex Yaffe

Attorney at Foshee & Yaffe Law Firm

Po Box 890420

Oklahoma City, OK 73189

Defendant Attorneys

Don W. Danz

Attorney at Holden Litigation

15 E 5Th St, Ste 3900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jennifer Pantina

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199-3600

Rocky C. Tsai

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (CA)

Three Embarcadero Ctr

San Francisco, CA 94111-4006

Ray E. Zschiesche

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joshua D. Burns

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

Sanford C. Coats

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

Joe M. Hampton

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce, PLLC

210 W Park Ave, Ste 2700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert G. McCampbell

Attorney at GableGotwals - OKC

211 N Robinson, 15Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ryan A. Ray

Attorney at Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler Jeter Barnett & Ray

401 S Boston, Ste 2900

Tulsa, OK 74103

D. Todd Riddles

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm, PLLC

311 N Harvey Ave, Ste 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Other Attorneys

Kaylee Davis-Maddy

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson OKC)

105 N Hudson, Ste 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael W. Ridgeway

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones, PLLC

2500 Mcgee Dr, Ste 140

Norman, OK 73072

D. Michael McBride, III

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (TUL)

321 S Boston, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103

Susan E. Huntsman

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (TUL)

321 S Boston, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103

Stuart D. Campbell

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 700

Tulsa, OK 74103-3117

Robert A. Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP (Dallas)

2200 Ross Ave, Ste 4100 W

Dallas, TX 75201

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Joint REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION to Stay ) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. ;(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

44 #15

Exhibit 15 - Cal Stay Order

44 #14

Exhibit 14 - WDVA Stay Order

44 #13

Exhibit 13 - EDVA Stay Order

44 #10

Exhibit 10 - Pawnee OK Stay Order

44 #9

Exhibit 9 - Delaware OK Stay Order

44 #5

Exhibit 5 - County Transfer Order

44 #3

Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order

#44

(#44) MOTION to Stay by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 5/13/2019(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

3 #9

Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Enlargement of Time

3 #8

Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance

3 #7

Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance

3 #6

Exhibit 6 - Entry of Appearance

3 #5

Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance

3 #4

Exhibit 4 - Motion for Enlargement of Time and Special Appearance

3 #3

Exhibit 3 - Petition

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Joint REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION to Stay ) by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. ;(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting #51 Janssen Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 6/4/2019(Ridgeway, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H. Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Remand ) by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners ;(Court, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION to Stay ) by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners ; (With attachments)(Court, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION to Stay by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 5/13/2019(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (McBride, D.) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/29/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1254945 (Re: #3 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 4/5/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 19-CJ-46 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#2) ***DUPLICATE-FILED IN ERROR*** CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/28/2019 to correct error (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corp., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.